House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:34 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 13, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Referred to joint committee on Finance | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 14, Noes 1 | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 12/27/2023 | Representative Green added as a coauthor | ||
House | 12/22/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities | ||
House | 12/22/2023 | Introduced |