Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Agriculture and Tourism | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Read a third time and passed | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Read a second time | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Representatives Palmeri and Macco added as coauthors | ||
House | 12/22/2023 | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor | ||
House | 12/22/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform | ||
House | 12/22/2023 | Introduced |