House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Senator Spreitzer added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Gundrum | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Gundrum | ||
House | 12/22/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections | ||
House | 12/22/2023 | Introduced |