House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 9, Noes 5 | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 9, Noes 5 | ||
House | 10/10/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 10/06/2023 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Representative Michalski added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Introduced |