LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Wisconsin WI
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
AB860
Action History
WI
Wisconsin Assembly Bill AB860
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Assembly Bill AB860
Action History
House
04/15/2024
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
House
01/31/2024
Representative Rozar added as a coauthor
House
01/11/2024
Public hearing held
House
01/10/2024
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kurtz
House
12/22/2023
Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance
House
12/22/2023
Introduced