House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 11, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 01/05/2024 | Representative Snodgrass added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/02/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families | ||
House | 01/02/2024 | Introduced |