House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:36 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 10, Noes 5 | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Introduced |