House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Representative Madison added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 16, Noes 0 | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 16, Noes 0 | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Representative Snodgrass added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Representative Clancy added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Introduced |