House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Representative Emerson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Laid on the table
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Representative Subeck added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Executive action taken by joint committee on Finance
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee on Rules and referred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Workforce Development and Economic Opportunities, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Representative Bare added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2024
|
Representative Shankland added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development and Economic Opportunities
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|