Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
11/06/2023
|
Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 8, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 12, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
08/01/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Spiros
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Representative Baldeh withdrawn as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Representatives Ratcliff and Stubbs withdrawn as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Spiros
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|