House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:44 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 3 | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 3 | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Referred to joint committee on Finance | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 6, Noes 5 | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 6, Noes 5 | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Born | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Introduced |