House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Senator Larson added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Senator Jacque added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Introduced |