House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Stubbs | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Jobs, Economy and Small Business Development, Ayes 11, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Jobs, Economy and Small Business Development, Ayes 11, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Stubbs and Gundrum | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Neylon | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Senator Larson added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Representative Binsfeld added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Jobs, Economy and Small Business Development | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Introduced |