House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kitchens | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Introduced |