Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Adopted | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Introduced |