Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Adopted | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-22-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Introduced |