Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 06/23/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 06/23/2023 | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 06/21/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 06/21/2023 | Adopted | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Placed on calendar 6-21-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Introduced |