Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR36 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/28/2023

                            LRB-2690/1
CMH:wlj
2023 - 2024  LEGISLATURE  
2023 ASSEMBLY JOINT RESOLUTIO N 36
April 28, 2023 - Introduced by Representatives GUNDRUM and BODDEN, cosponsored
by Senator STROEBEL. Referred to Committee on Rules.
***AUTHORS SUBJECT TO CHANGE***
Relating to: congratulating the Rotary Club of Hartford, Wisconsin, USA, on its
100th anniversary.
Whereas, the Rotary Club of Hartford, Wisconsin, was sponsored by the Rotary
Club of Beaver Dam, Wisconsin; and
Whereas, the charter meeting of the Rotary Club of Hartford took place on April
24, 1924; and
Whereas, the Rotary Club of Hartford has been continuously active since its
founding at the charter meeting; and
Whereas, the positive effects the Rotary Club of Hartford has had on the
community are seen everywhere; and
Whereas, the Rotary Club of Hartford has also had positive effects
internationally, in many countries and in many ways; and
Whereas, the Rotary Club of Hartford's focus on benefits for youth, including
scholarships, students of the month, and foreign exchange programs, has affected
thousands of young people over the years; and
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15 - 2 -
LRB-2690/1
CMH:wlj
2023 - 2024  Legislature
Whereas, the Rotary Club of Hartford has sponsored new Rotary Clubs in West
Bend, Horicon, and Menomonee Falls; and
Whereas, the Rotary Club of Hartford's centennial year begins on July 1, 2023,
and ends on June 30, 2024; now, therefore, be it
Resolved by the assembly, the senate concurring, That the Wisconsin
Legislature congratulates the Rotary Club of Hartford, Wisconsin, USA, on its 100th
anniversary, wishes the club another 100 years of Service Above Self, and declares
that April 24, 2024, be observed with pride as Rotary Club of Hartford Day.
(END)
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9