House | 03/24/2023 | Report correctly enrolled on 3-24-2023 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Received from Senate concurred in | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Concurred in | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Placed on calendar 3-22-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Senator Roys added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Adopted | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Representatives Allen, August, Subeck and Edming added as coauthors | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Senator Jacque added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Placed on calendar 1-19-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Introduced |