House | 06/09/2023 | Report correctly enrolled on 6-9-2023 | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Received from Senate concurred in | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Concurred in | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Representative Madison added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Adopted | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Representatives Ratcliff and Clancy added as coauthors | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Referred to calendar of 5-17-2023 pursuant to Assembly Rule 45 (1) | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Introduced |