Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 06/12/2023 | Senator Marklein added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Adopted | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Senator Cabral-Guevara added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Introduced |