House
|
10/05/2023
|
Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 5
|
|
|
House
|
07/07/2023
|
Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 7-7-2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled on 6-29-2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2023
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Hutton, James, Kapenga, L. Johnson, Larson, Pfaff, Quinn, Smith, Stafsholt, Testin, Tomczyk, Wanggaard, Wimberger and Wirch of the Senate added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Concurred in by unanimous rising vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Senator Knodl added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-28-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2023
|
Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Representative Macco added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-21-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Read and referred to Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|