House | 10/24/2023 | Representative Clancy added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Report correctly enrolled on 10-19-2023 | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Received from Senate concurred in | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Concurred in | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 10/16/2023 | Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 10/13/2023 | Senator Cowles added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/12/2023 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Adopted | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Representatives Shankland and Schraa added as coauthors | ||
House | 10/11/2023 | Senators Marklein, L. Johnson and Hesselbein added as cosponsors | ||
House | 10/11/2023 | Representatives Palmeri and Subeck added as coauthors | ||
House | 10/11/2023 | Senator Ballweg added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 10/10/2023 | Referred to calendar of 10-12-2023 pursuant to Assembly Rule 45 (1) | ||
House | 10/10/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/10/2023 | Introduced |