House | 10/18/2023 | Report correctly enrolled on 10-18-2023 | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Received from Senate concurred in | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Concurred in | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Received from Assembly | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Adopted | ||
House | 10/16/2023 | Senator Spreitzer added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 10/16/2023 | Representatives Callahan and Gustafson added as coauthors | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Representatives Allen and Schraa added as coauthors | ||
House | 10/11/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/11/2023 | Introduced |