House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/13/2023 | Representatives Gustafson and Ratcliff added as coauthors | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Introduced |