House | 02/01/2024 | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 2-1-2024 | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Report correctly engrossed on 1-17-2024 | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Adopted | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/16/2023 | Representative Schraa added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Introduced |