Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AR21 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/08/2023

                            LRB-4941/1
SEJ:amn
2023 - 2024  LEGISLATURE  
2023 ASSEMBLY RESOLUTIO N 21
November 8, 2023 - Introduced by Representatives MACCO, AUGUST, BINSFELD,
DITTRICH, GOYKE, KITCHENS, KRUG, MAGNAFICI, MURPHY, MURSAU, OHNSTAD,
PENTERMAN, PETRYK, SINICKI, SORTWELL, SPIROS, STEFFEN, TITTL and TRANEL.
Referred to Committee on Rules.
***AUTHORS SUBJECT TO CHANGE***
Relating to: honoring the life and public service of Representative John L. Klenke.
Whereas, John Klenke was born to Donald and Carol Klenke on April 25, 1958,
in Green Bay, Wisconsin; and
Whereas, John Klenke graduated from Southwest High School in 1976, from
the University of Wisconsin-Madison with a bachelor's degree in accounting and
finance in 1980, and from the University of Wisconsin-Milwaukee with a master's
degree in business administration in 1982; and
Whereas, John Klenke began his career at Arthur Andersen before working for
over 20 years at Schneider National, where he served as treasurer, vice president of
corporate strategy, division president, and director of corporate tax; and
Whereas, John Klenke was elected to represent the 88th Assembly District in
November 2010 and went on to serve in the Wisconsin State Assembly for two
consecutive terms; and
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13 - 2 -2023 - 2024  Legislature
LRB-4941/1
SEJ:amn
Whereas, during his time in the assembly, John Klenke served on the powerful
Joint Committee on Finance and as Vice Chair of the Assembly Committee on Energy
and Utilities; and
Whereas, while serving in the legislature, John Klenke authored and advocated
for various bills concerning energy policy and economic development; and
Whereas, John Klenke married Charlotte Klenke, his wife of 23 years, at Holy
Cross Catholic Church on February 26, 2000; and
Whereas, John Klenke was a loving father and grandfather to his six children
and 15 grandchildren; and
Whereas, John Klenke retired to Lake Martin in Dadeville, Alabama, where he
enjoyed spending time on the lake with his family; and
Whereas, John Klenke passed away peacefully on October 10, 2023, at the age
of 65; and
Whereas, John Klenke will be best remembered for his love and devotion to his
Catholic faith and to his family, as well as for his accomplished career in both the
private sector and the Assembly; now, therefore, be it
Resolved by the assembly, That the members of the Wisconsin State
Assembly join in honoring the life and public service of Representative John L.
Klenke and extend their condolences to his family and friends.
(END)
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20