House | 02/26/2024 | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 2-26-2024 | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Report correctly engrossed on 2-19-2024 | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Adopted | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Introduced |