House | 06/16/2023 | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 6-16-2023 | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | Report correctly engrossed on 5-19-2023 | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Adopted | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Referred to calendar of 5-17-2023 pursuant to Assembly Rule 45 (1) | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Introduced |