Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 09/14/2023 | Senator Spreitzer added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 08/15/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 08/15/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 5, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 08/15/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Representative Cabrera added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | LRB correction (Senate Amendment 1) | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Ballweg | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Representative Myers added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Representative Drake added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Senator Cowles added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Introduced |