Senate
|
10/26/2023
|
Published 10-26-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/26/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 10-25-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 34
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 10-19-2023 by directive of the Majority Leader
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Representatives Vining and Drake added as cosponsors
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-28-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Senator Hesselbein added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator James
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Representative Moore Omokunde added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Representative Snodgrass added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senator Agard added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|