Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Introduced |