Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Published 5-9-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 5-8-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 5-4-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on calendar 4-18-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Placed on calendar 3-22-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|