Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Published 3-15-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-14-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 110
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-11-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:04 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/29/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/29/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/28/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2023
|
Senator Hesselbein added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Representative Joers added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Representative Pronschinske added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senator Spreitzer added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Representative Kitchens added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Representative Dallman added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|