House
|
05/15/2024
|
Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-15-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Received from Senate passed notwithstanding the objections of the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Passed notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, Ayes 22, Noes 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Rules suspended and taken up
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2024
|
Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-29-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:05 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 22, Noes 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/29/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/29/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/28/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|