Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 09/11/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 09/11/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 09/11/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 09/05/2023 | Senator James added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 09/05/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 09/01/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Representative Cabrera added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Introduced |