Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2024
|
Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-29-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
LRB correction
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Action ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in as amended
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Senator Hutton added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 22, Noes 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Nass
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|