Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Published 3-28-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-27-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 233
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-21-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Action ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in as amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Born
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:10 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 28, Noes 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from joint committee on Finance and take up
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Referred to joint committee on Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|