Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Senator Pfaff added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Introduced |