Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 10/06/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 10/06/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 5, Noes 1 | ||
Senate | 09/15/2023 | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/13/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 08/15/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 07/14/2023 | Senators Hesselbein and Carpenter added as coauthors | ||
Senate | 07/12/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 06/21/2023 | Representatives Snodgrass and Emerson added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 06/20/2023 | Representative Cabrera added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Representatives Joers and Andraca added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Representatives Madison and Clancy added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Introduced |