Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 06/02/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 06/02/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 3, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Representative Dittrich added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Introduced |