House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 21, Noes 11 | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Read a second time | ||
Senate | 10/16/2023 | Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 10/05/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 10/05/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Ayes 3, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 10/05/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 09/27/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Elections and Consumer Protection | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Introduced |