Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 10/23/2023 | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Representative Donovan added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Introduced |