Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/28/2023 | Representative Joers added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Representatives Emerson and Tittl added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Introduced |