Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 10/05/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 10/05/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Ayes 3, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 10/05/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 09/27/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Representative Kitchens added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Elections and Consumer Protection | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Introduced |