Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Technical Colleges, Ayes 4, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Representative Kitchens added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development and Technical Colleges | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Introduced |