Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Representative Neubauer added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 6, Noes 1 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 11/21/2023 | Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/13/2023 | Representative Riemer added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Senator L. Johnson added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 09/19/2023 | Representative McGuire added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 08/28/2023 | Senator Larson added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 08/01/2023 | Representative Moore Omokunde added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Senator Hesselbein added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Representative Billings added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Representative Bare added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Representative Shelton added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Introduced |