Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Published 6-22-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 6-21-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 13
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 6-16-2023 by directive of the Majority Leader
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Action ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Taken off the Assembly message, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1b)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in as amended
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tranel
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Read
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate Amendment 2 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Representatives Nedweski and Wichgers added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Senate Amendment 2 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
LRB correction (Senate Substitute Amendment 1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|