Senate
|
12/07/2023
|
Published 12-7-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 12-6-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 70
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 11-30-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Placed on calendar 9-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2023
|
Representative Ratcliff added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Quinn
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|