Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Senator Pfaff added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/22/2023 | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 08/23/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 07/18/2023 | Representative Madison added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Introduced |